Heermann et al v. Alchemme, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Heermann, Bianca Jackson and Cole Scroggs
Defendant: Alchemme, LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd. and RB Health (US) LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00195
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cooke, Kristen)
May 15, 2024 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Motion to Sever and Transfer, or Alternatively, to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Class Action filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Defendant RB Health (US) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Cooke, Kristen)
May 15, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Motion to Sever and Transfer, or Alternatively, to Dismiss in Favor of First-Filed Class Action filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/29/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cooke, Kristen)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen for Alchemme, LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., and Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
May 8, 2024 Filing 13 Motion to allow David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9000577) filed by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Alchemme, LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc.. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Andrew Soukup for RB Health (US) LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
May 7, 2024 Filing 11 Motion to allow Andrew Soukup to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8998176) filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC. (Cooke, Kristen)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 RB Health's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. RB Health shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before May 28, 2024. Signed on 5/1/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/14/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cooke, Kristen)
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Defendant RB Health (US) LLC.(Cooke, Kristen)
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC (Attorney Kristen A. Cooke added to party RB Health (US) LLC(pty:dft))(Cooke, Kristen)
April 19, 2024 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Defendants Alchemme, LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc..(Wunderlich, Sandra)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Alchemme, LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc. (Attorney Sandra J. Wunderlich added to party Alchemme, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra J. Wunderlich added to party Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra J. Wunderlich added to party Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft))(Wunderlich, Sandra)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. RB Health (US) LLC served on 4/9/2024, answer due 4/30/2024. (Dickson, Melody)
April 1, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RB Health (US) LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jamie Heermann, Cole Scroggs, Bianca Jackson. Waiver sent to Alchemme, LLC on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024; Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd. on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024; Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc. on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Dickson, Melody)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8919609. Service due by 6/17/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heermann et al v. Alchemme, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Heermann
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Jackson
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Scroggs
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Melody Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alchemme, LLC
Represented By: David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Health (US) LLC
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Kristen A. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?