Millenia Productions, LLC v. KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Millenia Productions, LLC
Defendant: KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC and Ma Vin Dhat
Case Number: 4:2024cv00231
Filed: April 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Taylor Brooke Concannon Hausmann on behalf of Defendants Ma Vin Dhat, KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC.(Concannon Hausmann, Taylor)
May 22, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Ma Vin Dhat, KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC.(Attorney Taylor Brooke Concannon Hausmann added to party Ma Vin Dhat(pty:dft), Attorney Taylor Brooke Concannon Hausmann added to party KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC(pty:dft))(Concannon Hausmann, Taylor)
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Millenia Productions, LLC. Ma Vin Dhat served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024; KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Fishman, Erin)
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Judge Gaddy no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 24-231-CV-W-SRB. (Melvin, Greg)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is related to another case previously assigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.9 and with Judge Bough's consent, this case is transferred to Judge Bough for all further proceedings. Signed on 4/3/24 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
April 1, 2024 Filing 3 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 6,131,353 6,131,352 6,131,354 6,142,919 6,456,590 5,835,371 6,131,351 5,935,006 5,388,491 6,882,430 6,785,236 7,178,023. Plaintiff(s): Millenia Productions, LLC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Erin Michelle Fishman Kennyhertz Perry, LLC 2000 Shawnee Mission Parkway Ste 210 Mission Woods, KS 66205 816-652-9310 Email: erin.fishman@kennyhertzper Defendant(s): KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC et al The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Woods, Gloria)
April 1, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ma Vin Dhat, KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC filed by Erin Michelle Fishman on behalf of Millenia Productions, LLC. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8938481. Service due by 7/1/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Fishman, Erin)
April 1, 2024 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 4/22/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millenia Productions, LLC v. KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millenia Productions, LLC
Represented By: Erin Michelle Fishman
Represented By: Arthur A Chaykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KDS Nail Manufactory International, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Brooke Concannon Hausmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ma Vin Dhat
Represented By: Taylor Brooke Concannon Hausmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?