Murphy v. Kennedy
Plaintiff: Sandy Murphy
Defendant: Christian Kennedy
Case Number: 4:2024cv00518
Filed: August 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Phyllis Norman on behalf of Plaintiff Sandy Murphy.(Norman, Phyllis)
September 27, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Christian Kennedy.(Doherty, Mimi)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/18/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2025 at 10:00 AM via telephone conference before District Judge Greg Kays. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2025 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 9/17/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
September 6, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christian Kennedy filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Christian Kennedy.(Doherty, Mimi)
August 29, 2024 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Nancy Kenner(Norman, Phyllis)
August 16, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/16/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/30/2024. Signed on 8/14/24 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL STANDING ORDER. All attorneys and unrepresented parties shall carefully study and comply with the ISO along with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Western District of Missouri's Local Rules (the Local Rules). Failure to comply with the ISO may result in the Court imposing sanctions, including but not limited to monetary payments, dismissal of claims or cases, entry of default judgment, or other appropriate sanctions. Signed on 8/14/24 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 8, 2024 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Christian Kennedy.(Doherty, Mimi)
August 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV18893, filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9141911. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Doherty, Mimi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Murphy
Represented By: Eric Korth
Represented By: Adam W. Graves
Represented By: Phyllis Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Kennedy
Represented By: Mimi Elizabeth Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?