Bartolotta v. eBay Inc.
Plaintiff: Amanda Bartolotta
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Case Number: 4:2025cv00015
Filed: January 9, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2025 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Notice of Commencement of Arbitration by Amanda Bartolotta, eBay Inc.. (Graham, Gene)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO STAY PENDING ARBITRATION AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORTS #12 The case is STAYED pending arbitration.The parties shall file a Notice within 30 days confirming that arbitration proceedings have commenced. The parties are also directed to file a Joint Status Report within 180 days after arbitration proceedings have commenced, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed on 2/4/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
February 4, 2025 Status Report due by 3/6/2025. (Cordell, Annette)
January 30, 2025 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to stay case pending arbitration filed by Melissa D Hill on behalf of eBay Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/13/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hill, Melissa)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/17/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 3/3/2025. Signed on 1/28/25 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant eBay Inc. shall have until and including January 30, 2025 to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed on 1/15/2025 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
January 14, 2025 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of eBay Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/28/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 & #6 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Derek S. Franklin and Melissa Hill for eBay Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
January 10, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 10, 2025 Filing 6 Motion to allow Derek S. Franklin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9376263) filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of eBay Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2025 Filing 5 Motion to allow Melissa D. Hill to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number BMOWDC-9376020) filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of eBay Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing "Notice of Filing Notice of Removal" with State Court by eBay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2025 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of Defendant eBay Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Subsidiaries & Affiliates)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington on behalf of eBay Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV33863, Filing fee $405, receipt number CMOWDC-9375363. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages (State Court), #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Case Filings (Besides Petition), #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Katie Lawhon, #5 Exhibit 4 - Judicial Caseload Profile)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartolotta v. eBay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bartolotta
Represented By: Deborah J Blakely
Represented By: Bryan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Represented By: Derek S. Franklin
Represented By: Derek S. Franklin
Represented By: Melissa D Hill
Represented By: Melissa D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?