Achterberg v. Albaugh, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laura Achterberg
Defendant: Albaugh, LLC, Employer Solutions Staffing Group II, LLC and Labtech Specialty Staffing Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv06097
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: St. Joseph Office
County: Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 38:4301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed on 11/30/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ON TRIAL BRIEF. Signed on 11/29/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 78 motion to bifurcate. Signed on 11/28/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment and 55 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed on 11/7/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 10/18/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Achterberg v. Albaugh, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Achterberg
Represented By: Kirk Daniel Holman
Represented By: Kenneth D Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albaugh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employer Solutions Staffing Group II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labtech Specialty Staffing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?