Dulin et al v. Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Dulin and Tanille Dulin
Defendant: Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv06191
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE (Stipulation of dismissal due by 3/25/2019.) Counsel has notified the Court that this case has settled. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the clerk administratively terminate this action without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen the proceedings for good cause shown, for the entry of any stipulation or order, or for any other purpose required to obtain a final determination of the litigation. On or before March 25, 2019, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal signed by the parties who have appeared in the action, under Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If no such stipulation is received within the specified time and the parties have not reopened for the purpose of obtaining a final determination, this order shall constitute, for purposes of Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court's entry of final judgment of dismissal with prejudice under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed on 2/25/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stepp, Jane)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that the mediation conference is scheduled for 9:00 am Central Time, on April 18, 2019, in Courtroom 6B, United States Courthouse, 400 East Ninth Street, Kansas City, Missouri. Should this case be settled by the parties before the scheduled mediation conference, the parties shall call my chambers at 816-512-1910 and inform me of the settlement agreement. Signed on 2/21/19 by US Bankruptcy Judge Brian T Fenimore. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 unopposed motion to stay discovery while the Court considers the pending motion to compel arbitration. Signed on 2/20/19 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to stay (Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay for 30 Days) filed by Michael L. Belancio on behalf of Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Belancio, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #4 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed by Michael L. Belancio on behalf of Defendant Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Belancio, Michael) Modified on 2/1/2019: Docket text changed to reflect filing event. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement) filed by Michael L. Belancio on behalf of Defendant Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC.(Belancio, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Jeffrey Dulin, Tanille Dulin, Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #4 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed by David McLane Bryan on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Dulin, Tanille Dulin. Reply suggestions due by 1/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Bryan, David)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by David McLane Bryan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney David McLane Bryan added to party Jeffrey Dulin(pty:pla), Attorney David McLane Bryan added to party Tanille Dulin(pty:pla))(Bryan, David)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/25/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 2/11/2019. Signed on 1/14/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to compel (Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed by Michael L. Belancio on behalf of Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B', #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E', #8 Exhibit F)(Belancio, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition) on behalf of Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC.(Belancio, Michael)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to both plaintiff and defendant attorneys. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Brian T. Fenimore. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Platte County, case number 18AE-CC00381, filed by Michael L. Belancio on behalf of Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6097719. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B)(Belancio, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dulin et al v. Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Dulin
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: David McLane Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanille Dulin
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: David McLane Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenton Nissan of Tiffany Springs, LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Belancio
Represented By: Emily Lynn Cipra
Represented By: W. James Foland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?