Welchel v. Cameron R-1 School District et al
Plaintiff: Susan Welchel
Defendant: Matt Robinson, Tiffani Collins, Cameron R-1 School District and Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District
Case Number: 5:2019cv06012
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District, Cameron R-1 School District, Tiffani Collins, Matt Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Boggiano, Wendy)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 2/22/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Susan Welchel. Matt Robinson served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Zmijewski, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Susan Welchel. Cameron R-1 School District served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Zmijewski, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Susan Welchel. Tiffani Collins served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Zmijewski, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Susan Welchel. Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Zmijewski, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time. Defendants are granted an extension of time to 3/7/2019 in which to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed on 2/19/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Shawver, Marylynn)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time filed by Wendy D Boggiano on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggiano, Wendy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Grant D Wiens on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Grant D Wiens added to party Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District(pty:dft), Attorney Grant D Wiens added to party Cameron R-1 School District(pty:dft), Attorney Grant D Wiens added to party Tiffani Collins(pty:dft), Attorney Grant D Wiens added to party Matt Robinson(pty:dft))(Wiens, Grant)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas A Mickes on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Thomas A Mickes added to party Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas A Mickes added to party Cameron R-1 School District(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas A Mickes added to party Tiffani Collins(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas A Mickes added to party Matt Robinson(pty:dft))(Mickes, Thomas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Wendy D Boggiano on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Wendy D Boggiano added to party Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy D Boggiano added to party Cameron R-1 School District(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy D Boggiano added to party Tiffani Collins(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy D Boggiano added to party Matt Robinson(pty:dft))(Boggiano, Wendy)
January 28, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher S Dove on behalf of Susan Welchel. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6142159. Service due by 4/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dove, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welchel v. Cameron R-1 School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Robinson
Represented By: Thomas A Mickes
Represented By: Grant D Wiens
Represented By: Wendy D Boggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffani Collins
Represented By: Thomas A Mickes
Represented By: Grant D Wiens
Represented By: Wendy D Boggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron R-1 School District
Represented By: Thomas A Mickes
Represented By: Grant D Wiens
Represented By: Wendy D Boggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Cameron R-1 School District
Represented By: Thomas A Mickes
Represented By: Grant D Wiens
Represented By: Wendy D Boggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Welchel
Represented By: Christopher S Dove
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?