Williams v. Corizon et al
Plaintiff: Regina Williams
Defendant: Valicia Kirby, Dr. Thomas K. Bredeman, Stormi Moeller, Corizon, Jenny Meehan and Karen Epperson
Case Number: 5:2019cv06018
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Corizon. Waiver sent to Corizon on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Thomas K. Bredeman. Waiver sent to Thomas K. Bredeman on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Stormi Moeller. Waiver sent to Stormi Moeller on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jenny Meehan. Waiver sent to Jenny Meehan on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Karen Epperson. Waiver sent to Karen Epperson on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Valicia Kirby. Waiver sent to Valicia Kirby on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Defendants Thomas K. Bredeman, Corizon, Karen Epperson, Valicia Kirby, Jenny Meehan, Stormi Moeller.(Eckenrode, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Thomas K. Bredeman, Corizon, Karen Epperson, Valicia Kirby, Jenny Meehan, Stormi Moeller (Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Thomas K. Bredeman(pty:dft), Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Corizon(pty:dft), Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Karen Epperson(pty:dft), Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Valicia Kirby(pty:dft), Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Jenny Meehan(pty:dft), Attorney J. Thaddeus Eckenrode added to party Stormi Moeller(pty:dft))(Eckenrode, J.)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to seal Exhibit A attached to her complaint (Doc. #10 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to place Plaintiff's Exhibit A under seal. Signed on March 20, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (CLERK'S NOTE: Plaintiff's exhibit to complaint has been sealed as directed.)(Davies, Cindy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to seal exhibits to complaint (Doc. 1-1) filed by Regina Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/3/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid ($285.84); (2) Corizon notify the Court, in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, for which Defendants they will and will not waive service of process; and (3) Defendants answer or otherwise respond, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and 12, within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order if service of process is waived, or within twenty-one (21) days after service of process if service of process is not waived. Signed on February 26, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
February 25, 2019 RECEIPT number KCMO075923 in the amount of $64.16 issued to Regina Williams. (Woods, Gloria)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that: (1) Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #5 ) is denied; and (2) Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #4 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed on 2/19/2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Doty, Greg)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $64.16; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before March 5, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on February 19, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Regina Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/5/2019. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Davies, Cindy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Regina Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/5/2019. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davies, Cindy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Regina Williams. (Davies, Cindy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Regina Williams. (Davies, Cindy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Regina Williams. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Corizon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valicia Kirby
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas K. Bredeman
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stormi Moeller
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Meehan
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Epperson
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?