Stephenson v. Railcrew Xpress
Plaintiff: Debra Stephenson
Defendant: Railcrew Xpress
Case Number: 5:2019cv06054
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: St. Joseph Office
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order of Dismissal. In light of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice #32 , all charges against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed on May 29, 20202, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Debra Stephenson (Graham, Kevin)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 motion for approval of settlement. Signed on May 14, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for order to Approve FLSA Settlement filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeVeney, Jeannie)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #28 motion for leave to file settlement under seal. Signed on May 6, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for leave to file Under Seal filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 11:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 2/4/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 joint motion to amend/correct scheduling order. Signed on January 30, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
January 30, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint on behalf of Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to amend/correct #18 Scheduling Order, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie)
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Railcrew Xpress filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson.(Davids, Brooke)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER finding as moot #19 motion for leave to file. This motion was granted in Doc. 21 . Signed on 1/16/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 unopposed motion to amend/correct. Signed on 1/16/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 Amended MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Davids, Brooke)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Davids, Brooke)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 11:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 9/5/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In light of Plaintiff's dismissal without prejudice of Count II, the motion to dismiss is moot. Signed on September 4, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Whitney Fay on behalf of Defendant Railcrew Xpress.(Fay, Whitney)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Railcrew Xpress. (Fay, Whitney)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Plaintiff Debra Stephenson.(Davids, Brooke)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Dismissal of Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Debra Stephenson (Davids, Brooke)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Whitney Fay on behalf of Railcrew Xpress (Attorney Whitney Fay added to party Railcrew Xpress(pty:dft))(Fay, Whitney)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time. Signed on July 16, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II, #7 Suggestions in Support of Motion To Dismiss filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 , #7 ) (Davids, Brooke)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/12/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/26/2019. Signed on 7/12/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Railcrew Xpress. (Related document(s) #6 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due July 2, 2019. Signed on May 31, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Railcrew Xpress. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Jeannie M. DeVeney added to party Railcrew Xpress(pty:dft))(DeVeney, Jeannie)
May 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Railcrew Xpress. (Woods, Gloria)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Railcrew Xpress filed by Brooke Amos Davids on behalf of Debra Stephenson. Filing fee $400, receipt number 36514D. Service due by 7/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Davids, Brooke) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Railcrew Xpress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Stephenson
Represented By: Kevin A Graham
Represented By: Brooke Amos Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railcrew Xpress
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Whitney Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?