Life Insurance Company of North America v. Saliger et al
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Kailie N. Saliger and Scott W. Saliger
Case Number: 5:2019cv06081
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/27/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/13/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/29/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs on behalf of Scott W. Saliger.(Attorney Pamela J. Welch added to party Scott W. Saliger(pty:dft))(Welch, Pamela)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for default judgment against Kailie N. Saliger filed by James M Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of James M. Brodzik)(Brodzik, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Chris Crockett served on 7/2/2019. (Brodzik, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Life Insurance Company of North America. John Brissett served on 7/2/2019. (Brodzik, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE (SEALED) by Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Brodzik, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file documents under seal (Doc. #3) is GRANTED. Signed on 7/3/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kailie N. Saliger, Scott W. Saliger. (Woods, Gloria)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Daniel K. Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Attorney Daniel K. Ryan added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:pla))(Ryan, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to file Documents Under Seal filed by James M Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brodzik, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by James M Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Brodzik, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader and other Relief against Kailie N. Saliger, Scott W. Saliger filed by James M Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6380770. Service due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Brodzik, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Insurance Company of North America v. Saliger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kailie N. Saliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott W. Saliger
Represented By: Pamela J. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: James M Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?