Roman v. Affinity Media Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Roman
Defendant: Affinity Media Services, LLC and THM Management, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv06095
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THM Management, LLC. (Houston, Kiambu)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Whitney Roman. (Shaffer, Arthur)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to Affinity Media Services, LLC on July 31, 2019 by Whitney Roman., RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Whitney Roman. Waiver sent to Affinity Media Services, LLC on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Waiver of Service due by 8/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shaffer, Arthur)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to THM Management, LLC on July 31, 2019 by Whitney Roman. Waiver of Service due by 8/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Waiver_unsigned)(Shaffer, Arthur)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to Affinity Media Services, LLC on July 31, 2019 by Whitney Roman. Waiver of Service due by 8/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Waiver_unsigned)(Shaffer, Arthur)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ***Remark - Report on the Filing of an action sent via regular mail to the Register of Copyrights office. (Woods, Gloria)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants filed by Arthur K. Shaffer on behalf of Whitney Roman. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6423825. Service due by 10/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registration)(Shaffer, Arthur) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Affinity Media Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Roman
Represented By: Arthur K. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Media Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THM Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?