McCown v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Linda McCown
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv06102
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Daniel K. Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Attorney Daniel K. Ryan added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Ryan, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (Rule 7.1) filed by James M Brodzik on behalf of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. Answer or other response due 10/9/19. Signed on 9/5/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for extension of time filed by James M Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brodzik, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by James M Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Attorney James M Brodzik added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Brodzik, James)
August 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Woods, Gloria)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Kyle Henry Sciolaro on behalf of Linda McCown. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6445580. Service due by 11/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciolaro, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCown v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: James M Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McCown
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?