Eggert et al v. Welcher et al
Plaintiff: Fred Eggert and Rose Eggert
Defendant: Brian Welcher and Powell Farms, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv06118
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing Rule 26 notice by Rose Eggert (Schulte, Samuel)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020. Teleconference set for 5/14/2021 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2021 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 10/17/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher. (Sanders, Brendon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Amended Notice of Removal from Holt County, case number 19HO-CC00024, filed by Brendon Sanders on behalf of Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6487040.(Sanders, Brendon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher filed by Brendon Sanders on behalf of Defendants Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher.(Sanders, Brendon)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court has considered the Notice of Removal and directs Defendants to amend the Notice of Removal or show cause why the case should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Within fourteen days from the date of this Order, Defendants shall either amend the Notice of Removal or show cause why the case should not be remanded. Signed on 9/17/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher filed by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of Defendants Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher.(Kinder, Jacqueline)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Brendon Sanders on behalf of Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher (Attorney Brendon Sanders added to party Powell Farms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brendon Sanders added to party Brian Welcher(pty:dft))(Sanders, Brendon)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/29/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/15/2019. Signed on 9/13/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal by Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kinder, Jacqueline)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of Defendants Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kinder, Jacqueline)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Consent to Removal by Brian Welcher (Kinder, Jacqueline)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of All Defendants (Kinder, Jacqueline)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Holt County, Missouri County, case number 19HO-CC00024, filed by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of Powell Farms, LLC, Brian Welcher. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6487040. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinder, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggert et al v. Welcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Welcher
Represented By: Jacqueline M Kinder
Represented By: Brendon Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell Farms, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Kinder
Represented By: Brendon Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Eggert
Represented By: Samuel Bennett Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Eggert
Represented By: Samuel Bennett Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?