Balliu v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Robert Balliu
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv06121
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Dismissal. Signed on 10/30/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 11/8/2019. Signed on 10/10/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, William)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Attorney William E. Hanna added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Hanna, William)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Robert Balliu. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
September 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Woods, Gloria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Kyle Henry Sciolaro on behalf of Robert Balliu. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6491022. Service due by 12/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciolaro, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balliu v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Balliu
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?