Doe v. Bearden et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Jane Doe and Jane Doe
Defendant: Director Anne L. Precythe, Mr. Edward Bearden and Edward Bearden
Case Number: 5:2019cv06161
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Jane Doe. (Ammann, John)
February 9, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES by Plaintiff filed by John J. Ammann on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe.(Ammann, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Edward Bearden. Waiver sent to Edward Bearden on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Taulbee, Nicolas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Nicolas Taulbee on behalf of Edward Bearden (Attorney Nicolas Taulbee added to party Edward Bearden(pty:dft))(Taulbee, Nicolas)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/24/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 2/10/2020. Signed on 1/9/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance and Waiver of Service by Michael Pritchett on behalf of Anne L. Precythe (Attorney Michael Pritchett added to party Anne L. Precythe(pty:dft))(Pritchett, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2020: Docket text changed to reflect document title and contents. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Jenifer C Snow on behalf of Jane Doe (Attorney Jenifer C Snow added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla))(Snow, Jenifer)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Ryan J. Gavin on behalf of Jane Doe (Attorney Ryan J. Gavin added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla))(Gavin, Ryan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6630632. Service due by 3/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ammann, John) Modified on 12/17/2019 to correct docket text only to show filed against defendants; NEF regenerated (Ellis, Lindsey).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Bearden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Anne L. Precythe
Represented By: Michael Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Edward Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bearden
Represented By: Nicolas Taulbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Jane Doe
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John J. Ammann
Represented By: Ryan J. Gavin
Represented By: Jenifer C Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?