Scavuzzo's, Inc. v. Justus
Plaintiff: Scavuzzo's, Inc.
Defendant: Jeffrey Justus and Mortgage Research Center, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06001
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:3301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Scavuzzo's, Inc.. Mortgage Research Center, LLC served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (McPherson, Brendan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Scavuzzo's, Inc. on behalf of Jeffrey Justus.(Bond, Trenton)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Trenton K. Bond on behalf of Jeffrey Justus (Attorney Trenton K. Bond added to party Jeffrey Justus(pty:dft))(Bond, Trenton)
February 4, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Scavuzzo's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(McPherson, Brendan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Scavuzzo's, Inc.. Jeffrey Justus served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (McPherson, Brendan)
January 9, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Justus. (Woods, Gloria)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Justus filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Scavuzzo's, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6654941. Service due by 4/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McPherson, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scavuzzo's, Inc. v. Justus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scavuzzo's, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Samuel Barfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Justus
Represented By: Trenton K. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Research Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?