Wilson et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Andrews, Ronetta Walkup, Charles E. Wilson and Doug Walkup
Defendant: Reed Chevrolet LLC, General Motors LLC and Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06061
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of filing (Request for Judicial Notice) by General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC, Reed Chevrolet LLC re #24 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , #22 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #23 MOTION to strike plaintiffs' nationwide class and non-Missouri subclass allegations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION to strike plaintiffs' nationwide class and non-Missouri subclass allegations filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of Defendants General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC, Reed Chevrolet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Variations in State Laws)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to strike plaintiffs' nationwide class and non-Missouri subclass allegations filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC, Reed Chevrolet LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of Defendants General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC, Reed Chevrolet LLC. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC, Reed Chevrolet LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of Defendant Reed Chevrolet LLC.(Attorney Crystal Nix-Hines added to party Reed Chevrolet LLC(pty:dft))(Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of Defendant Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC.(Attorney Crystal Nix-Hines added to party Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC(pty:dft))(Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Crystal Nix-Hines on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC.(Nix-Hines, Crystal)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Premier Automotive's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC. (Torline, Stephen)
June 3, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christine W. Chen for General Motors LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Tina T. Lo for General Motors LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Shon Morgan for General Motors LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Crystal Nix-Hines for General Motors LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/10/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/26/2020. Scheduling Teleconference set for 7/22/2020 at 10:30 a.m., before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. See order for conference call-in numbers. Signed on 5/28/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to allow Christine W. Chen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6873432) filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Torline, Stephen) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/29/2020) (Berner, Crystal).
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to allow Tina T. Lo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6873425) filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Torline, Stephen) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/29/2020) (Berner, Crystal).
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to allow Shon Morgan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6873413) filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Torline, Stephen) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/29/2020) (Berner, Crystal).
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to allow Crystal Nix-Hines to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6873405) filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Torline, Stephen) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/29/2020) (Berner, Crystal).
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors LLC (Attorney Stephen J. Torline added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Torline, Stephen)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant General Motors LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Kelly Andrews, Doug Walkup, Ronetta Walkup, Charles E. Wilson. (McDowell, Jessica)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please make note of the new case number 20-06061-CV-SJ-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to randomly reassign this case for all further matters. Signed on 4/23/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
April 22, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors LLC, Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC, Reed Chevrolet LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica Marie McDowell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Jessica Marie McDowell added to party Kelly Andrews (pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Marie McDowell added to party Doug Walkup (pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Marie McDowell added to party Ronetta Walkup (pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Marie McDowell added to party Charles E. Wilson(pty:pla))(McDowell, Jessica)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants filed by Ryan Paulus on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6830836. Service due by 7/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paulus, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Andrews
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronetta Walkup
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Wilson
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Walkup
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Chevrolet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Automotive of Northwest Missouri, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?