Provisur Technologies, Inc. v. Weber, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Provisur Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Breidenbach, Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Neubrandenburg, Textor, Inc., Weber, Inc. and Textor Maschinenbau GmbH
Case Number: 5:2020cv06069
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 Before this Court is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Doc. #5). For good cause stated, the Motion is granted. Defendants have until August 3, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed on 5/20/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Signed on 5/20/20 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Jason Scott Leiker on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Jason Scott Leiker added to party Textor Maschinenbau GmbH(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Scott Leiker added to party Textor, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Scott Leiker added to party Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Breidenbach(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Scott Leiker added to party Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Neubrandenburg(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Scott Leiker added to party Weber, Inc.(pty:dft))(Leiker, Jason)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing of an action regarding patent number(s) 10,625,436 10,639,812. Plaintiff(s): Provisur Technologies, Inc. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Jeffrey J. Simon, Husch Blackwell LLP-KCMO, 4801 Main Street, Suite 1000, Kansas City, MO 64112-2551 Defendant(s): Webert, Inc., Textor, Inc., Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Breidenbach, Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Neubrandenburg, Textor Maschinenbau GmbH The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 AO 120) (Woods, Gloria)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of Plaintiff Provisur Technologies, Inc..(Simon, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Patent Infringement against All Defendants filed by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of Provisur Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6847932. Service due by 8/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provisur Technologies, Inc. v. Weber, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Breidenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Neubrandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textor Maschinenbau GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provisur Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Brooke Concannon Hausmann
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?