Vanderpool v. Rolf et al
Plaintiff: James Dean Vanderpool
Defendant: Jeff Nelson, Dennis Rolf and Allen Braug
Case Number: 5:2020cv06120
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by a $2.28 initial partial filing fee, as previously ordered. (Davies, Cindy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by a $2.28 initial partial filing fee, as previously ordered. Signed on September 25, 2020 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that, because Plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered, Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before September 22, 2020, as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Courts Orders. Signed on 9/8/2020 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $2.28; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before September 3, 2020, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on August 20, 2020 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by James Dean Vanderpool. (Davies, Cindy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by James Dean Vanderpool. (Davies, Cindy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James Dean Vanderpool. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanderpool v. Rolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dean Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Rolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Braug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?