Doe v. Eckerson et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: lisa worrell, Joshua Quinn Eckerson, Harrison County and The Estate of Joshua Q. Eckerson
Case Number: 5:2020cv06135
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jane Doe. Waiver sent to Lisa Worrell on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Gardner, Chad)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Patrick Sullivan on behalf of Defendant Lisa Worrell. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Sullivan, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Patrick Sullivan on behalf of Lisa Worrell. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sullivan, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by John Patrick Sullivan on behalf of Lisa Worrell (Attorney John Patrick Sullivan added to party Lisa Worrell(pty:dft))(Sullivan, John)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jane Doe. Waiver sent to Harrison County on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Gardner, Chad)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 motion for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym. Signed on 10/8/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to Documents 2 and 3 filed on 9/3/2020 The documents have been deleted as the documents were filed in error. Counsel has been notified. The Civil Cover Sheet attached to Document 1 has been restricted to case participants as it contains personal identifying information. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION for order Order to Proceed Under Psuedonym filed by Chad G Gardner on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Gardner, Chad)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for order Order to Proceed Under Psuedonym filed by Chad G Gardner on behalf of Jane Doe. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gardner, Chad)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 (ENTRY DELETED DUE TO A FILING ERROR). COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chad G Gardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number 5114653. Service due by 12/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, # 2 Supplement Motion to proceed under Psuedonym, # 3 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Psuedonym)(Gardner, Chad). Modified on 9/4/2020 to delete document. (Moore, Terri).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 (ENTRY DELETED DUE TO A FILING ERROR). COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chad G Gardner on behalf of Jane Doe. Filing fee $400, receipt number 5114653. Service due by 12/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet )(Gardner, Chad). Modified on 9/4/2020 to delete document. (Moore, Terri).
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chad G Gardner on behalf of Jane Doe. Filing fee $400, receipt number 5114653. Service due by 12/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Gardner, Chad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/14/2020) (Moore, Terri).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Eckerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Chad G Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lisa worrell
Represented By: John Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Quinn Eckerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Joshua Q. Eckerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?