United States v. United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: United States Currency
Case Number: 5:2020cv06137
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to United States Currency. United States Currency served on 10/1/2020. (Farmakidis, Leigh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 CLAIM filed by United States Currency. United States Currency answer due 11/2/2020. filed by William David Mueller on behalf of Defendant United States Currency. (Mueller, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of United States Currency.(Mueller, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by William David Mueller on behalf of United States Currency (Attorney William David Mueller added to party United States Currency(pty:dft))(Mueller, William)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States (Farmakidis, Leigh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Otis Jackson by United States (Farmakidis, Leigh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Hertz Vehicles, LLC by United States (Farmakidis, Leigh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Hertz Vehicles, LLC by United States (Farmakidis, Leigh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Jorge D. Hernandez, Jr. by United States (Farmakidis, Leigh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $77,939 in United States Currency filed by Leigh Farmakidis on behalf of United States. Filing fee waived. Service due by 12/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farmakidis, Leigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Leigh Farmakidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Currency
Represented By: William David Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?