United Specialty Insurance Company v. Cosgrove et al
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company and Series 1 of Oxford Insurance Company NC LLC
Defendant: Robert Cosgrove, Wyatt Henderson, Travis Wheeler, Grant Evans, Jeffrey Lucero, Timothy Rasta, Sultan Trans, Inc., Khamidjon Murodov and Mike Kenway
Case Number: 5:2021cv06137
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/13/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/27/2022. Signed on 12/13/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Lauren Dollar on behalf of Robert Cosgrove, Grant Evans, Wyatt Henderson, Mike Kenway, Jeffrey Lucero, Timothy Rasta, Travis Wheeler (Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Robert Cosgrove(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Grant Evans(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Wyatt Henderson(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Mike Kenway(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Jeffrey Lucero(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Timothy Rasta(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Dollar added to party Travis Wheeler(pty:dft))(Dollar, Lauren)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Robert Cosgrove, Grant Evans, Wyatt Henderson, Mike Kenway, Jeffrey Lucero, Timothy Rasta, Travis Wheeler (Dollar, Tim)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time filed by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Robert Cosgrove, Grant Evans, Wyatt Henderson, Mike Kenway, Jeffrey Lucero, Timothy Rasta, Travis Wheeler. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Robert Cosgrove(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Grant Evans(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Wyatt Henderson(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Mike Kenway(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Jeffrey Lucero(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Timothy Rasta(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Travis Wheeler(pty:dft))(Dollar, Tim)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to deposit/invest funds filed by John G. Schultz on behalf of Series 1 of Oxford Insurance Company NC LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schultz, John)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to dismiss party Sultan Trans INC. and Khamidon Murodov filed by John G. Schultz on behalf of Series 1 of Oxford Insurance Company NC LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schultz, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John G. Schultz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number 402. Service due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Schultz, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company v. Cosgrove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 1 of Oxford Insurance Company NC LLC
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cosgrove
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt Henderson
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Wheeler
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Evans
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lucero
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Rasta
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sultan Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khamidjon Murodov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kenway
Represented By: Tim Eugene Dollar
Represented By: Lauren Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?