Wall v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wall
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. and Softsheen-Carson, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv06128
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Status Report due by 4/12/2023. (Mitchell, Lisa)
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Wall. L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Wall. L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 19, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Wall. Softsheen-Carson, Inc. served on 1/12/2023, answer due 2/2/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting extension of time for defendants to file responsive pleading re #10 Stipulation filed by L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc. Defendants to respond to the Class Action Complaint forty-five (45) days after the JPML rules on the pending Motion to Transfer. Parties to file joint status report 90 days from the date of this Order and every 90 days thereafter until Motion to Transfer is ruled. Signed on 1/12/23 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
January 12, 2023 Status Report due by 4/12/2023. (Mitchell, Lisa)
January 11, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Defendants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc..(Morris, James)
January 11, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading by L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc.. (Morris, James)
January 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine C Battisti on behalf of L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc. (Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party L'Oreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party Softsheen-Carson, Inc.(pty:dft))(Battisti, Katherine)
January 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by James C. Morris on behalf of L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc. (Attorney James C. Morris added to party L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Morris added to party L'Oreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Morris added to party Softsheen-Carson, Inc.(pty:dft))(Morris, James)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Jennifer Wall (Attorney Vanessa H. Gross added to party Jennifer Wall(pty:pla))(Gross, Vanessa)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc. filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Jennifer Wall.(Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 and #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jennifer M. Hoekstra and Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler for Jennifer Wall allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to allow Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8233482) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Jennifer Wall. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to allow Jennifer M. Hoekstra to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8233451) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Jennifer Wall. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, Inc. filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Jennifer Wall. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8217346. Service due by 3/2/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kuntz, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wall
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Vanessa H. Gross
Represented By: Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hoekstra
Represented By: Jonathan P. Kieffer
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Softsheen-Carson, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?