Michel, Jr v. Honeywell International et al
Plaintiff: John Carl Michel, Jr
Defendant: Honeywell International, CIGNA and agent Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2023cv06119
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Attorney William E. Hanna added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Hanna, William)
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to vacate Defendant Honeywell International's Motion to Vacate Initial Case Deadlines filed by Jordan Kurdi on behalf of Honeywell International. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kurdi, Jordan)
November 2, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT JOHN CARL MICHEL JR. against All Defendants All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent request to amend complaint to include Life Insurance Company of North America. and to correct reason for filing on Civil cover sheet docket says ERISA and Federal Question when it should be 320 liable Defamation/slander)(Michel, Jr, John)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 unopposed motion to amend/correct. (1) Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before 11/7/2023, and (2) Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is stayed pending the filing of Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed on 10/27/2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara) Modified on 10/27/2023 to reflect copy of order mailed to John Carl Michel, Jr 910 South 39th Street Saint Joseph, MO 64507 (Woods, Gloria).
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Notice of Consent to P's Request to Amend Petition and to Stay Deadline to Respond to P's Original Petition by Honeywell International re #6 MOTION to amend/correct (Kurdi, Jordan)
October 18, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/5/2023 as Document No. 7, Waiver of Service of Summons. The document has been deleted as the document was entered incorrectly. Counsel will refile the document selecting the appropriate party. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Honeywell International answer due 10/20/2023. Signed on 10/10/2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara) Modified on 10/10/2023 to reflect a copy of the text order mailed to John Carl Michel, Jr 910 S. 39th Street St. Joseph, MO 64507 (Woods, Gloria).
October 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Judge Gaddy is no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 23-6119-CV-SJ-RK. (Melvin, Greg)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by CIGNA. Waiver sent to CIGNA on 10/5/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Hanna, William)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION to amend complaint filed by John Carl Michel, Jr. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-6, #4 Exhibit 7-16, #5 Exhibit 17-22, #6 Exhibit 23-25, #7 Exhibit 26-29, #8 Exhibit 30-33)(Grube, Cheyenne)
October 4, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CIGNA. (Woods, Gloria)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jordan Kurdi on behalf of Honeywell International. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/4/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Jordan Kurdi added to party Honeywell International(pty:dft))(Kurdi, Jordan)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. The parties' disclosure statements shall be filed by 10/6/2023. The Rule 26 conference must take place on or before 10/24/2023. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall be filed by 11/7/2023. Signed on 9/20/23 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (A copy of this Order was sent via U.S. Mail to John Carl Michel, Jr., 910 S. 39th Street, St. Joseph, MO 64507.)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) Modified on 9/15/2023 to reflect copy of the MAP Notice and General Order mailed to pro se plaintiff at John Carl Michel, Jr. 910 S. 39th St. St. Joseph, MO 64507 (Woods, Gloria).
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Honeywell International (Mack, Cristin)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Buchanan County, case number 23BU-CC01157, filed by Cristin J Mack. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8625844. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. State Court File)(Mack, Cristin)
September 15, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to John Carl Michel and Honeywell International: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/6/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. Paper copy of the Magistrate Assignment form mailed to pro se plaintiff at John Carl Michel, Jr. 910 S. 39th St. St. Joseph, MO 64507 (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michel, Jr v. Honeywell International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carl Michel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International
Represented By: Cristin J Mack
Represented By: Jordan Kurdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: agent Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?