Wright v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krista Wright
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Procter & Gamble Co., Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP and Wal-Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv06120
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Before the Court is Defendants Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's (collectively, Walmart") Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #13.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Walmart may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 30 days after the JPML issues its decision on the pending motion to transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed on 10/30/23 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 30, 2023 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/13/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggs, Beth)
October 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Wal-Mart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boggs, Beth)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Before the Court is Defendants RB Health (US) LLC ("RB Health") and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s ("JJCI") Motion to Stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #8.) Upon review, RB Health and JJCI's request for a stay is DENIED. However, RB Health and JJCI's request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that RB Health and JJCI may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 30 days after the JPML issues its decision on the pending motion to transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed on 10/20/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Borneman, Sara)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Plaintiff Krista Wright. Reply suggestions due by 11/3/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Cartmell, Thomas)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Cooke, Kristen)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cooke, Kristen)
October 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Attorney Kristen A. Cooke added to party Reckitt Benckiser LLC(pty:dft))(Cooke, Kristen)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher J. Schmidt on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc. (Attorney Christopher J. Schmidt added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Schmidt added to party Kenvue Inc.(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Christopher)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Krista Wright. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Kronawitter, Joseph)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Krista Wright. Reckitt Benckiser LLC served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Kronawitter, Joseph)
September 21, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Magistrate Judge Counts is no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 23-6120-CV-SJ-SRB. (Melvin, Greg)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/10/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Procter & Gamble Co., Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. filed by Joseph A. Kronawitter on behalf of Krista Wright. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8629540. Service due by 12/18/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kronawitter, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Wright
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Represented By: Kirk J Goza
Represented By: Robert A. Horn
Represented By: Taylor Foye
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Tyler Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenvue Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By: Kristen A. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP
Represented By: Beth C. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Beth C. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?