Christine v. Jenny Mehann et al
Plaintiff: Earl Christine
Defendant: Jenny Mehann, Corizon Medical, Centurion Medical and Mo D.O.C. Staff Member Mr. Fry
Interested Party: Melvin Leroy Tyler
Case Number: 5:2023cv06158
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Roseann A Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff's "Notice" (Doc. #17 ), wherein Plaintiff seeks to join parties and asks this Court to set a date for a "special investigation," is denied. As set forth in this Court's January 4, 2024 Order (Doc. #15 ), joinder of the various prisoners who have submitted pleadings in this case is not appropriate. Rather, if Plaintiff or any individual prisoner wishes to pursue relief in this Court, they must file a new, separate case by submitting individual complaints. This case is closed. Signed on 1/11/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Doty, Greg)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to add parties filed by Earl Christine. (Willis, Kathy)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Willis, Kathy)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth herein. Signed on 1/4/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Willis, Kathy)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Douglas Neary. (Willis, Kathy)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Luis Pereida. (Willis, Kathy)
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Shane McNair. (Willis, Kathy)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Shane McNair.(Willis, Kathy)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that:(1) plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a);(2) plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this complaint on or before DECEMBER 20, 2023;(3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of this Order along with court-approved forms including in forma pauperis forms; and (4) FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Signed on 12/5/2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Order along with court-approved forms including in forma pauperis forms mailed to Plaintiff as directed.)(Willis, Kathy)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:23-cv-03534.
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Western District of Missouri, St. Joseph Division (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JennelleGonzalez, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ON TRANSFER re: The motions for the appointment of counsel and joinder filed by Earl Christine are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to reconsideration after transfer. Dkts 3 & 5. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JennelleGonzalez, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
November 30, 2023 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Missouri, St. Joseph Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 11/30/2023., filed. (JennelleGonzalez, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION To Consider as Class Action and Certification of the Cause by Earl Christine, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2023. (MayraMarquez, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Joinder by Melvin Leroy Tyler, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/30/2023. (AkeitaMichael, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Earl Christine, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/31/2023) (AaronJackson, 4). CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Earl Christine, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/31/2023) (AaronJackson, 4). [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Earl Christine, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2023. (MarcelleLaBee, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Earl Christine. (AaronJackson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/1/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine v. Jenny Mehann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Christine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Mehann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mo D.O.C. Staff Member Mr. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Melvin Leroy Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?