Locke et al v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roy A. Locke and Laverna D. Locke
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2009cv03060
Filed: February 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability Office
County: Taney
Presiding Judge: Richard E Dorr
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, case dismissed with prejudice pursuant to stipulation. (Schroeppel, Kerry)
November 9, 2009 Filing 23 STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven)
November 6, 2009 Filing 22 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. (Schroeppel, Kerry)
November 6, 2009 Filing 21 AMENDED SCHEDULING & JURY TRIAL ORDER: discovery ddl 2/26/2010, dispositive motions ddl 3/26/2010, pretrial teleconference 7/7/2010 03:00 PM, jury trial set for 7/19/2010 09:00 AM in District Courtroom 1, Springfield. (Schroeppel, Kerry)
November 4, 2009 Filing 20 LETTER OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge William A. Knox to District Judge Richard E. Dorr. This is a change in judge only. The case number should now read 09-3060-CV-S-RED. TEXT ENTRY ONLY - no document is attached. (Price, Jackie)
August 11, 2009 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar, Inc. of Rsp to Plaintiff's Discovery filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven)
July 3, 2009 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William)
July 2, 2009 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke Plaintiffs' First Request To Produce filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William)
July 1, 2009 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke First Interrogatories To Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William)
July 1, 2009 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven)
July 1, 2009 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar, Inc. filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery other than for depositions of health care providers due by 2/26/2010; dispositive motions due by 3/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 6/2/2009. (Bode, Kay)
May 29, 2009 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Rule 16 Notice. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/29/2009; Rule 26 conference due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 4/1/2009. (Bode, Kay)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot #3 motion to dismiss case; granting #6 motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 3/30/2009. (Bode, Kay)
March 27, 2009 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven)
March 27, 2009 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven)
March 20, 2009 Filing 7 RESPONSE to motion re #6 MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 4/6/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court (Sanders, Steven)
March 18, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/2/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (McDonald, William)
March 17, 2009 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/1/2009 (Price, Jackie)
March 13, 2009 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plts This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
March 12, 2009 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven)
March 12, 2009 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Sanders, Steven)
March 12, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION to dismiss case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/27/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sanders, Steven)
March 12, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Sanders, Steven)
February 20, 2009 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caterpillar, Inc.. (Anderson, Christy)
February 20, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of all plaintiffs. Filing fee $350, receipt number 08660000000002002670. Service due by 6/23/2009.(McDonald, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2009: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Christy).
February 19, 2009 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/16/2009 (Siegert, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locke et al v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A. Locke
Represented By: William H. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverna D. Locke
Represented By: William H. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Steven P. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?