Choice Escrow and Land Title, LLC v. BancorpSouth Bank
Plaintiff: Choice Escrow and Land Title, LLC
Defendant: BancorpSouth Bank
Case Number: 6:2010cv03531
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: John T. Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 219 motion to dismiss case with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed on 9/18/14 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 160 defendant BancorpSouth Bank's motion for summary judgment. Signed on 3/18/2013 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 78 motion regarding sufficiency of plaintiff's responses and granting 80 motion to dismiss defendant's counterclaims. Signed on 8/20/12 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 39 motion to strike portions of first amended answer. Signed on 2/14/12 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that 25 MOTION to strike 23 Second Amended Complaint filed by BancorpSouth Bank is DENIED on its merits. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their proposed scheduling order on or before November 28, 2011. Signed on 10/25/11 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Accordingly Count III of the First Amended Petition is DISMISSED. Signed on 6/30/11 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Alexander, Pam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choice Escrow and Land Title, LLC v. BancorpSouth Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Escrow and Land Title, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McCurry
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancorpSouth Bank
Represented By: Bruce McCurry
Represented By: Rodney H. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?