Crisler v. Matthews Richards Healthcare Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Reena Crisler
Defendant: Matthews Richards Healthcare Management, LLC
Counter_claimant: Matthews Richards Healthcare Management, LLC
Counter_defendant: Reena Crisler
Case Number: 6:2014cv03373
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Unknown
Presiding Judge: M. Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 motion for partial summary judgment; denying 92 motion for summary judgment Signed on 10/14/15 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Amos, Gloria)
October 31, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 motion to dismiss case. Signed on 10/31/2014 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Hance, Breanna)
August 28, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, and denying in part defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. The court denies defendant's request to dismiss, but grants a transfer to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 08/28/2014. (mg) [Transferred from ksd on 8/28/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisler v. Matthews Richards Healthcare Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reena Crisler
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews Richards Healthcare Management, LLC
Represented By: Aaron M. Klusmeyer(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mathew L Placzek
Represented By: Anthony M. Singer(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Matthews Richards Healthcare Management, LLC
Represented By: Aaron M. Klusmeyer(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mathew L Placzek
Represented By: Anthony M. Singer(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Reena Crisler
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?