Flack v. Citizens Memorial Hospital

Plaintiff: Wesley W. Flack
Defendant: Citizens Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 6:2018cv03236
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Springfield Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT against Citizens Memorial Hospital Wesley W. Flack.NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica R Hill on behalf of Citizens Memorial Hospital (Attorney Jessica R Hill added to party Citizens Memorial Hospital(pty:dft))(Hill, Jessica)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Citizens Memorial Hospital (Hammons, John)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/26/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/11/2018. Signed on 9/11/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Defendant Citizens Memorial Hospital. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Hammons, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Citizens Memorial Hospital. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney John D. Hammons, Jr added to party Citizens Memorial Hospital(pty:dft))(Hammons, John)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Kevin Fitzgerald. (Burch, Steve)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Wesley W. Flack. Citizens Memorial Hospital served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 21, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citizens Memorial Hospital, and returned to Plaintiff for service. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. With the Consent of the Honorable M. Douglas Harpool this case reassigned to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool for all further proceedings. District Judge Stephen R. Bough no longer assigned to case. Signed on 8/7/18 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Copy of this order mailed to: Wesley W. Flack, 3879 West STATE HWY O, Springfield, MO 65803. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Citizens Memorial Hospital Wesley W. Flack Filing fee $400, receipt number KCMO072121. Service due by 10/31/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) Modified on 8/6/2018 to add receipt number.(Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flack v. Citizens Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley W. Flack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Memorial Hospital
Represented By: John D. Hammons, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica R Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?