Williams et al v. Ride the Ducks International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ilena Williams, Ina-Robins Williams, Judith Williams and Robert Damian Williams
Defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC, Ride the Ducks of Branson, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc. d/b/a Ride The Ducks, Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Amphibious Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC, Duck Development LLC, Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation and Ripley Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv03370
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC.(Krueger, Kevin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 44 SUGGESTIONS in support re #43 MOTION to strike References to Other DUKW Boat Incidents filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Defendant Ride the Ducks International, LLC. (Related document(s) #43 ) (Krueger, Kevin)
December 31, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to strike References to Other DUKW Boat Incidents filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Krueger, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint on behalf of Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation.(Idelevich, Anna)
December 19, 2018 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anna Idelevich on behalf of Defendant Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation.(Idelevich, Anna)
December 18, 2018 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Patrick Fitzgerald on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Fitzgerald, Patrick)
December 6, 2018 Filing 39 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Defendant Ride the Ducks International, LLC.(Krueger, Kevin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC.(Krueger, Kevin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 37 SUGGESTIONS in support re #36 MOTION to strike References to Other DUKW Boat Incidents filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Defendant Ride the Ducks International, LLC. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Krueger, Kevin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to strike References to Other DUKW Boat Incidents filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Krueger, Kevin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of appearance by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC (Attorney Kevin P. Krueger added to party Ride the Ducks International, LLC(pty:dft))(Krueger, Kevin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of appearance by Andrew D Ryan on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC (Attorney Andrew D Ryan added to party Ride the Ducks International, LLC(pty:dft))(Ryan, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of appearance by Lawrence S Hall on behalf of Ride the Ducks International, LLC (Attorney Lawrence S Hall added to party Ride the Ducks International, LLC(pty:dft))(Hall, Lawrence)
December 5, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of filing Notice of Stay of This Action Under The Limitation of Liability Act by Ripley Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order)(Good, Terrance)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 & #30 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys David A Dial and Richard Hoyt Hill, II for Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 30 Motion to allow RICHARD H. HILL, II to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6054786) filed by Anna Idelevich on behalf of Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation. (Idelevich, Anna)
November 29, 2018 Filing 29 Motion to allow DAVID A. DIAL to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6054761) filed by Anna Idelevich on behalf of Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation. (Idelevich, Anna)
November 28, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for extension of time Agreed Motion to Set and/or Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Alexandra C. Wells on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wells, Alexandra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of appearance by Anna Idelevich on behalf of Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation (Idelevich, Anna)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 ,& #24 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys John W Patton, Jr, Paul D Motz, Kelly L Ferron, Benjamin J Levinsky, and Roman Edward Solowski for Ripley Entertainment, Inc. and Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand on behalf of Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation.(Attorney Anna Idelevich added to party Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation(pty:dft))(Idelevich, Anna)
November 27, 2018 Filing 24 Motion to allow Roman E. Solowski to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6049642) filed by Terrance J. Good on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. (Good, Terrance)
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 Motion to allow Benjamin J. Levinsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6049635) filed by Terrance J. Good on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. (Good, Terrance)
November 27, 2018 Filing 22 Motion to allow Kelly L. Ferron to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6049627) filed by Terrance J. Good on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. (Good, Terrance)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to allow Paul D. Motz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6049603) filed by Terrance J. Good on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. (Good, Terrance)
November 27, 2018 Filing 20 Motion to allow John W. Patton, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6049590) filed by Terrance J. Good on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. (Good, Terrance)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of appearance by Terrance J. Good on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney Terrance J. Good added to party Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Terrance J. Good added to party Ripley Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Good, Terrance)
November 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of appearance by Scott Pummell on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney Scott Pummell added to party Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Pummell added to party Ripley Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pummell, Scott)
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Alexandra C. Wells on behalf of Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney Alexandra C. Wells added to party Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra C. Wells added to party Ripley Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wells, Alexandra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Duck Development LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Krukow, Tony)
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Ride the Ducks International, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Krukow, Tony)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Ride the Ducks of Branson, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Krukow, Tony)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Amphibious Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Krukow, Tony)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Thomas R Kline for plaintiffs allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of FILING PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSION REGARDING PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE LIMITATION ACTION filed by Linda Shick on behalf of Ilena Williams, Ina-Robins Williams, Judith Williams, Robert Damian Williams. (Travis, Kendra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Ripley Entertainment, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Travis, Kendra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Travis, Kendra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Travis, Kendra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to allow Thomas R. Kline to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6034269) filed by Patrick Fitzgerald on behalf of Ilena Williams, Ina-Robins Williams, Judith Williams, Robert Damian Williams. (Fitzgerald, Patrick) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/13/2018) (Crocker, Susan).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 & #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Patrick Fitzgerald and Linda M Shick for plaintiffs allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to allow Linda M. Shick to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6021921) filed by Tony D. Krukow on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Krukow, Tony)
November 5, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amphibious Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC, Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Duck Development LLC, Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation, Ride the Ducks International, LLC, Ride the Ducks of Branson, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to allow Patrick J. Fitzgerald to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6021387) filed by Tony D. Krukow on behalf of Ilena Williams, Ina-Robins Williams, Judith Williams, Robert Damian Williams. (Krukow, Tony)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable M. Douglas Harpool this case is reassigned to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool for all further proceedings. District Judge Stephen R. Bough no longer assigned to case Signed on 11/5/18 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amphibious Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC, Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC, Duck Development LLC, Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation, Ride the Ducks International, LLC, Ride the Ducks of Branson, LLC, Ripley Entertainment, Inc. d/b/a Ride The Ducks filed by Tony D. Krukow on behalf of Ilena Williams, Robert Damian Williams, Judith Williams, Ina-Robins Williams. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6019674. Service due by 1/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krukow, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Ride the Ducks International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilena Williams
Represented By: Tony D. Krukow
Represented By: Thomas R Kline
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Linda M Shick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina-Robins Williams
Represented By: Tony D. Krukow
Represented By: Thomas R Kline
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Linda M Shick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Williams
Represented By: Tony D. Krukow
Represented By: Thomas R Kline
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Linda M Shick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Damian Williams
Represented By: Tony D. Krukow
Represented By: Thomas R Kline
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Linda M Shick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ride the Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence S Hall
Represented By: Andrew D Ryan
Represented By: Kevin P. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ride the Ducks of Branson, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripley Entertainment, Inc. d/b/a Ride The Ducks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branson Duck Vehicles, LLC
Represented By: John W Patton, Jr.
Represented By: Roman Edward Solowski
Represented By: Kelly L Ferron
Represented By: Alexandra C. Wells
Represented By: Paul D Motz
Represented By: Benjamin J Levinsky
Represented By: Terrance J. Good
Represented By: Scott Pummell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amphibious Vehicle Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duck Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: David A Dial
Represented By: Richard Hoyt Hill, II
Represented By: Anna Idelevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripley Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: John W Patton, Jr.
Represented By: Roman Edward Solowski
Represented By: Kelly L Ferron
Represented By: Alexandra C. Wells
Represented By: Paul D Motz
Represented By: Benjamin J Levinsky
Represented By: Terrance J. Good
Represented By: Scott Pummell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?