United States of America v. Miscellaneous Computer Equipment
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Miscellaneous Computer Equipment
Claimant: Douglas Fullerton
Case Number: 6:2018cv03374
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION to stay proceedings filed by Douglas Fullerton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 PRO SE VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Douglas Fullerton on behalf of Claimant Douglas Fullerton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 PRO SE ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint on behalf of Douglas Fullerton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 PRO SE verified claim on behalf of Claimant Douglas Fullerton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Crocker, Susan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint on behalf of Douglas Fullerton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Crocker, Susan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Amended Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against Miscellaneous Computer Equipment filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America.(Perkins Rock, Stacey)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/6/2018 as Document No. 2, Notice of Inclusion for Mediation and Assessment Program (MAP). The document has been deleted as the document was filed in error. As a forfeiture case involving a defendant which is unable to consent, the matter should not have been designated as a MAP-assigned case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Burch, Steve)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Douglas Fullerton by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Roseann Ketchmark this case is reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge Stephen R. Bough no longer assigned to case Signed on 11/8/18 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In REm against Miscellenous Computer Equipment filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 2/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins Rock, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Miscellaneous Computer Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Computer Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Douglas Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?