Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC v. Dynomite Fireworks, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC
Defendant: Dynomite Wholesale, LLC and Dynomite Fireworks, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv03411
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Plaintiff Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC.(Burbach, Cheryl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Stephen H. Snead(Burbach, Cheryl)
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Derek Adam Ankrom on behalf of Defendants Dynomite Fireworks, LLC, Dynomite Wholesale, LLC.(Ankrom, Derek)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/5/2019 01:30 PM in (VJC), Springfield before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Discovery due by 7/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2019. Initial Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2020 01:30 PM Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Final Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2020 10:30 AM Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 08:30 AM in (VJC), Springfield before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on 1/30/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney)
January 30, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Burbach, Cheryl)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of appearance by C Blair Barbieri on behalf of Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC (Attorney C Blair Barbieri added to party Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC(pty:pla))(Barbieri, C)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of appearance by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC (Attorney Cheryl Lynn Burbach added to party Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC(pty:pla))(Burbach, Cheryl)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Dynomite Fireworks, LLC, Dynomite Wholesale, LLC.(Ankrom, Derek)
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of appearance by Rodney H. Nichols on behalf of Dynomite Fireworks, LLC, Dynomite Wholesale, LLC (Attorney Rodney H. Nichols added to party Dynomite Fireworks, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rodney H. Nichols added to party Dynomite Wholesale, LLC(pty:dft))(Nichols, Rodney)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of appearance by Derek Adam Ankrom on behalf of Dynomite Fireworks, LLC, Dynomite Wholesale, LLC (Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Dynomite Fireworks, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Derek Adam Ankrom added to party Dynomite Wholesale, LLC(pty:dft))(Ankrom, Derek)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 4,936,828. Plaintiff(s): Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Christopher Warrern Dawson, 10801 Mastin Blvd., Ste. 1000, 84 Corporate Woods, Overland Park, KS 66210 Defendant(s): Dynomite Fireworks, LLC and Dynomite Wholesale, LLC Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): Kathryn G. Lee, 40 Corporate Woods, 9401 Indian Creek parkway, Ste 700, Overland Park, KS 66210 The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Siegert, Karen)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/16/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/30/2019. Signed on 12/17/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Phillips, Caleb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas (Kansas City); Case Number 2:18-cv-02323-HLT-KGS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Plaintiff's Designation of Place for Trial, #4 Disclosure of Corporate Interests, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Entry of Appearance, #7 Clerk's Extension of Time, #8 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Memorandum in Support, #10 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #11 Reply to Response to Motion, #12 Docket Sheet - District of Kansas)(Siegert, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC v. Dynomite Fireworks, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crazy Debbies Fireworks LLC
Represented By: Christopher Warren Dawson
Represented By: Michael B. Hurd
Represented By: Cheryl Lynn Burbach
Represented By: C Blair Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynomite Wholesale, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn G Lee
Represented By: Derek Adam Ankrom
Represented By: Rodney H. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynomite Fireworks, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn G Lee
Represented By: Derek Adam Ankrom
Represented By: Rodney H. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?