Boring v. Drury University
Plaintiff: Samantha Boring
Defendant: Drury University
Case Number: 6:2019cv03017
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Samantha Boring. Waiver sent to Samantha Boring on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (O'Laughlin, Matt)
January 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drury University, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Drury University. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6123992. Service due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Laughlin, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boring v. Drury University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Boring
Represented By: Matt O'Laughlin
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Represented By: Amy Kathleen P. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drury University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?