DaCosta v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Plaintiff: Jason DaCosta
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv03032
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Chorny, Traci)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason DaCosta re #6 Offer and Acceptance of Judgment filed by Raymond Lampert on behalf of Plaintiff Jason DaCosta. Related document: #6 Offer and Acceptance of Judgment filed by Jason DaCosta.(Lampert, Raymond)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Offer and Acceptance of Judgment by Jason DaCosta. (Lampert, Raymond)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 4/19/2019. Rule 26 conference due on or before 4/5/2019. Signed on February 26, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Defendant Kraft Heinz Foods Company's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kraft Heinz Foods Company (Ericsson, Shelley)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Kraft Heinz Foods Company.(Attorney Shelley Irene Ericsson added to party Kraft Heinz Foods Company(pty:dft))(Ericsson, Shelley)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 2/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kraft Heinz Foods Company filed by Raymond Lampert on behalf of Jason DaCosta. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6145270. Service due by 4/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lampert, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DaCosta v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Represented By: Shelley Irene Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason DaCosta
Represented By: Raymond Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?