Larkin v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Susan Larkin
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 6:2019cv03063
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Nancy A. Berryhill, Susan Larkin. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Defendant)(Geiser, Angel)
February 15, 2019 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses returned via electronic mail to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Burch, Steve)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Susan Larkin. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Susan Larkin. Service due by 5/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Johnson, Melesa)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Susan Larkin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Susan Larkin(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Larkin
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?