Glover, et al v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Billy L. Glover and Jessica R. Glover
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv03067
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Billy L. Glover, Jessica R. Glover. Waiver sent to 3M Company on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Mathews, D.)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts no longer assigned to case Signed on 2/15/19 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Siegert, Karen)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for the plaintiffs. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company filed by D. Todd Mathews on behalf of BILLY L. GLOVER, JESSICA R. GLOVER. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6176295. Service due by 5/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mathews, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover, et al v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy L. Glover
Represented By: D. Todd Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica R. Glover
Represented By: D. Todd Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?