Rahder v. Seymour R-II School District

Plaintiff: Cathleen Rahder
Defendant: Seymour R-II School District
Case Number: 6:2019cv03074
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cathleen Rahder for Plaintiff's Amended First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Cathleen Rahder.(Kirksey, Jerry)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cathleen Rahder for Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Cathleen Rahder.(Kirksey, Jerry)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Cathleen Rahder.(Kirksey, Jerry)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Cathleen Rahder. Waiver sent to Seymour R-II School District on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Kirksey, Jerry)
March 18, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT sent via email to counsel for Plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) Emailed to Plaintiff's counsel.
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seymour R-II School District filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Cathleen Rahder. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6182244. Service due by 5/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirksey, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahder v. Seymour R-II School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Rahder
Represented By: Jerry M. Kirksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seymour R-II School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?