Barbero v. Cheatum
Plaintiff: Theresa Marie Barbero
Defendant: Steven Ray Cheatum
Case Number: 6:2019cv03172
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 First MOTION for leave to file amended complaint addendum in support of on behalf of Plaintiff Theresa Marie Barbero. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Barbero, Theresa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service unexecuted by USMS as to Steven Ray Cheatum. (Burch, Steve)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for leave to file amended complaint filed by Theresa Marie Barbero. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Barbero, Theresa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Harold F. Glass on behalf of Defendant Steven Ray Cheatum. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Glass, Harold)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Harold F. Glass on behalf of Steven Ray Cheatum. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Glass, Harold)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Harold F. Glass on behalf of Steven Ray Cheatum (Attorney Harold F. Glass added to party Steven Ray Cheatum(pty:dft))(Glass, Harold)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed as to Summons Issued to Steven Ray Cheatum Acknowledgement filed by Steven Ray Cheatum. (Love, Jeffery)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER Pending before the Court is pro se Plaintiff's Motion for Service Be Made Doc. #5 ). On June 5, 2019, this Court entered an order granting Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis and directed the Clerk of Court to issue summons and process upon the filing of the Complaint and deliver the same to the United States Marshal for service upon the Defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Service Be Made (Doc. #5 ) is deemed moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff via first class mail. Signed on June 11, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) Modified on 6/14/2019 **This order has been mailed to Theresa Marie Barbero, General Delivery, 1890 First Capitol Drive, Saint Charles, MO 63301. (Chorny, Traci).
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Service be Made filed by Theresa Marie Barbero. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Ray Cheatum. Copy of USM-285, Summons, Complaint, and Order [Doc. #3], hand-delivered to US Marshal for service. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Steven Ray Cheatum by Theresa Marie Barbero Service due by 9/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to File Action Without Payment of Fees With Affidavit of Financial Status in Support. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's Complaint and to issue summons and process upon the filing of the Complaint and deliver the same to the United States Marshal for service upon the Defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed on June 6, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) MAP documents and NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT mailed to Plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 6/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Theresa Marie Barbero. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 letter, #5 Envelope)(Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbero v. Cheatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ray Cheatum
Represented By: Harold F. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Marie Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?