Benedict et al v. State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Audrey Benedict and Don Benedict
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv03185
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company Objections filed by Nathan R. Taylor on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company.(Attorney Nathan R. Taylor added to party State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Taylor, Nathan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company of mailing Defendant's Responses to First Request for Admissions filed by Monte P. Clithero on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company.(Clithero, Monte)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jim Newberry(Clithero, Monte)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/3/2019 as Document No. 14, Designation of Neutral. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event under ADR Documents. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Neutral by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company filed by Monte P. Clithero on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company.(Clithero, Monte)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Cheryl Price Hom on behalf of Plaintiffs Audrey Benedict, Don Benedict.(Hom, Cheryl)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2020. Teleconference set for 6/26/2020 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2020 10:00 AM via teleconference. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 6/20/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Audrey Benedict, Don Benedict. (Hom, Cheryl)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories, Request for Production, and Request for Admission to Defendant State Farm filed by Cheryl Price Hom on behalf of Plaintiffs Audrey Benedict, Don Benedict.(Hom, Cheryl)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/8/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 6/24/2019. Signed on 5/24/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 motion to amend/correct Notice of Removal. The Amended Notice of Removal is accepted. Signed on 5/24/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Cheryl Price Hom on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Cheryl Price Hom added to party Audrey Benedict(pty:pla), Attorney Cheryl Price Hom added to party Don Benedict(pty:pla))(Hom, Cheryl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to amend/correct Notice of Removal filed by Monte P. Clithero on behalf of State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Clithero, Monte)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Defendants have not properly alleged diversity jurisdiction. Within fourteen days, Defendants shall either file an Amended Notice of Removal or show cause why the case should not be remanded to state court. Signed on 5/23/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Filing by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Clithero, Monte)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company.(Clithero, Monte)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Christian County, case number 19CT-CC00077, State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6325194. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit annual registration report, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit Civil cover sheet)(Clithero, Monte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedict et al v. State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company
Represented By: Monte P. Clithero
Represented By: Nathan R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Benedict
Represented By: Joseph I. Easter
Represented By: Cheryl Price Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Benedict
Represented By: Joseph I. Easter
Represented By: Cheryl Price Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?