Dean v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arnold Dean
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv03245
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Arnold Dean. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; Biomet, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Schnieders, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 , #11 , #12 , #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael F. Smith, Emalie Rott, Stephanie A Koltookian and, Robert C. Gallup for defendants allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Robert C. Gallup to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6449208) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Stephanie A. Koltookian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6449197) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Emalie L. Rott to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6448813) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow Michael F. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6446181) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Courts Admitted to Practice)(Dixon, Valerie)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/26/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/11/2019. Signed on 8/12/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet, Inc..(Dixon, Valerie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet Orthopedics, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet Manufacturing, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Dixon, Valerie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet Manufacturing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dixon, Valerie)
July 10, 2019 SUMMONSES ISSUED (4) as to Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (Siegert, Karen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Schnieders on behalf of arnold dean. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6393742. Service due by 10/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schnieders, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2019) (Siegert, Karen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Dean
Represented By: Christopher Schnieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Gallup
Represented By: Valerie L Dixon
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Gallup
Represented By: Valerie L Dixon
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Gallup
Represented By: Valerie L Dixon
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Gallup
Represented By: Valerie L Dixon
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?