Young v. Milsap
Plaintiff: Steve Young
Defendant: David Milsap
Case Number: 6:2019cv03247
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Clerk's Judgment filed by Steve Young. (Attachment: #1 COA letter)(Davies, Cindy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT filed by Steve Young.(Willis, Kathy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Steve Young. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/16/2019. (Willis, Kathy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for reconsideration filed by Steve Young. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/15/2019. (Willis, Kathy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If Plaintiff wishes to reassert his claims, he first must pay the filing and administrative fees totaling $400. (Willis, Kathy)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If Plaintiff wishes to reassert his claims, he first must pay the filing and administrative fees totaling $400. Signed on 07/16/2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Steve Young. (Davies, Cindy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Steve Young. (Davies, Cindy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sheriff David Milsap filed by Steve Young. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Milsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Milsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?