Wilkins v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Sheryl Ann Wilkins
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 6:2019cv03249
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 The Court hereby acknowledges the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #4). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 8/27/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William)
July 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America (emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service). (Siegert, Karen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing of exhibit A to be attached to Complaint by Sheryl Ann Wilkins re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A denial for Long Term Disability benefits)(Vasquez, Rick)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS..Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Rick S. Vasquez on behalf of Sheryl Ann Wilkins. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6397650. Service due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vasquez, Rick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Ann Wilkins
Represented By: Rick S. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?