Christopherson et al v. Bushner et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopherson and Derek Christopherson
Defendant: Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Federal Emergency Management Agency, Robert Bushner, Inez Pahlmann, Stantec, Inc., Connie Jo Bushner, The Dewberry Companies, Inc., WS Atkins, PLC, John Doe and Corelogic, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv03267
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Christopherson, Derek Christopherson. Connie Jo Bushner served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Stubblefield, Kory)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Christopherson, Derek Christopherson. Robert Bushner served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Stubblefield, Kory)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jennifer Christopherson, Derek Christopherson. Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Stubblefield, Kory)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jennifer Christopherson, Derek Christopherson. Waiver sent to Corelogic, Inc. on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Stubblefield, Kory)
September 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Connie Jo Bushner, Robert Bushner, Corelogic, Inc., Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Inez Pahlmann, The Dewberry Companies, Inc., and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 26, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Furtak, Rebecca)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 8/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. E-mailed to counsel for plaintiffs.(Furtak, Rebecca)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kory D. Stubblefield on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6418058. Service due by 10/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Stubblefield, Kory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Furtak, Rebecca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopherson et al v. Bushner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Pahlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stantec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Jo Bushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dewberry Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS Atkins, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopherson
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Christopherson
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?