Nusse v. Tracker Marine, LLC
Plaintiff: Zachariah Nusse
Defendant: Tracker Marine, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv03277
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zachariah Nusse Plaintiff's objections to defendant's first set of interrogatories and first request for production of documents filed by Benjamin A. Stringer on behalf of Plaintiff Zachariah Nusse.(Stringer, Benjamin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES Plaintiff's filed by Benjamin A. Stringer on behalf of Plaintiff Zachariah Nusse.(Stringer, Benjamin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James Rodney Holland, II on behalf of Defendant Tracker Marine, LLC.(Holland, James)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The only date changed is the Initial Pretrial Conference date. The Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 7/31/2020 10:30 AM via teleconference. Signed on September 4, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/13/2020. Status Conference set for 2/7/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 10:30 AM via teleconference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 01:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 9/7/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on September 4, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tracker Marine, LLC Re Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Spring E Taylor on behalf of Defendant Tracker Marine, LLC.(Taylor, Spring)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Mike Patton(Holland, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Zachariah Nusse. (Stringer, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Spring E Taylor on behalf of Tracker Marine, LLC (Attorney Spring E Taylor added to party Tracker Marine, LLC(pty:dft))(Taylor, Spring)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Tracker Marine, LLC.(Holland, James)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/6/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/20/2019. Signed on August 8, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James Rodney Holland, II on behalf of Defendant Tracker Marine, LLC.(Holland, James)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Christian County, MO County, case number 19CT-CC00155, filed by James Rodney Holland, II on behalf of Tracker Marine, LLC d/b/a Tracker Marine Group. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6432010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holland, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nusse v. Tracker Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachariah Nusse
Represented By: Benjamin A. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracker Marine, LLC
Represented By: James Rodney Holland, II
Represented By: Spring E Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?