McHugh v. Rockaway Beach, MO
Plaintiff: Daniel McHugh
Defendant: Rockaway Beach, MO
Case Number: 6:2019cv03293
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /Discovery Plan by Rockaway Beach, MO. (Keck, Patricia)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Stephen H. Snead(Keck, Patricia)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 8/16/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/20/2019 and NEF regenerated) (Siegert, Karen).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Rockaway Beach, MO.(Keck, Patricia)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Taney County, case number 1946-CC00081, filed by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of Rockaway Beach, MO. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6448209. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C- Civil Cover Sheet)(Keck, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh v. Rockaway Beach, MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McHugh
Represented By: Richard Magee, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockaway Beach, MO
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?