Norman v. The Central Trust Bank Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary W. Norman
Defendant: Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C., Metcalf Bank, First National Bank of Audrian County, Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C., The Central Trust Bank Inc., ONB Bank and Trust Company, Trans Union, Jefferson Bank of Missouri, Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc., Boone County National Bank, First National Bank of St. Louis, Investor Services Insurance, Inc., City Bank and Trust Company, Central Bank of Audrian County, Third National Bank, City Bank, Central Bancompany Inc., Empire Bank, Central Trust & Investment Holding Company, Equifax Inc., Central Bank of the Ozarks, Experian, Central Mortgage Company, First Central Bank, Central Trust & Investment Company and Ozark Mountain Bank
Case Number: 6:2019cv03295
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 86 PRO SE MOTION Plaintiff Gary W. Norman "Second Request" for an Order for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading as to #69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #64 MOTION to strike #2 Notice of filing,, #36 MOTION to strike , #1 Complaint, Trans Union, LLC's Joinder In Defendant Equifax's Motion To Strike The Complaint And RICO Case Statement [Doc. 36] and Equifax's Respons filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #69 , #72 , #67 , #65 , #64 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #79 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Craig L Sanders for Experian allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
October 11, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #58 MOTION for order, #83 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #58 MOTION for order Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Joinder in Trans Union, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #58 , #83 ) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #58 MOTION for order filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
October 9, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of filing Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time by Equifax Inc. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 81 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #58 MOTION for order to Disqualify Counsel filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendants Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Vollet, Heidi)
October 9, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE to motion re #74 MOTION for extension of time filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendants Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 79 Motion to allow Craig L. Sanders to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6526327) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. (Webb, Danne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for extension of time to submit reply in support of Equifax's motion to strike filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 77 Pro Se MOTION to strike Defendant's Experian Doc. #59 , Trans Untion Doc. [60, 64], and Equifax Doc. #61 for Violating Fed. R. Civ. P. "Rule 12(f)" filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 76 Pro Se MOTION for order for Full Disclosure of Filings-Transparency filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 75 Pro Se MOTION for order Judicial Determination on Everything Plaintiff Filed filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 74 Pro Se MOTION for extension of time filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 3, 2019 Filing 73 SUGGESTIONS in support re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Defendant Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #72 ) (Kintzel, Shelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kintzel, Shelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of appearance by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. (Attorney Shelly A. Kintzel added to party Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.(pty:dft))(Kintzel, Shelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 70 SUGGESTIONS in support re #69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendant Central Bancompany Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 68 SUGGESTIONS in support re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendant Central Trust & Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Central Trust & Investment Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 66 SUGGESTIONS in support re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendant The Central Trust Bank Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #65 ) (Vollet, Heidi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to strike #2 Notice of filing,, #36 MOTION to strike , #1 Complaint, Trans Union, LLC's Joinder In Defendant Equifax's Motion To Strike The Complaint And RICO Case Statement [Doc. 36] and Equifax's Response In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Mandatory Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiff's RICO Complaint [Doc. 37] filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 , #36 , #1 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 10/3/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
October 1, 2019 Filing 61 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #53 MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest, #55 MOTION for order to Disqualify These Persons G. Gabriel Zorogastaua, Phillip J.R. Zeek and Danne W. Webb Resp to Motions 51-55 filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #53 , #55 ) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 1, 2019 Filing 60 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #53 MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Defendant Trans Union. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
October 1, 2019 Filing 59 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #53 MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Webb, Danne)
September 26, 2019 Filing 58 PRO SE MOTION for order filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burch, Steve)
September 23, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for order DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS, MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO MOTION TO STRIKE, AND JOINDER IN REPLY [Doc 48] [Doc 51] filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne)
September 23, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of appearance by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian (Webb, Danne)
September 20, 2019 Filing 55 Pro Se MOTION for order to Disqualify These Persons G. Gabriel Zorogastaua, Phillip J.R. Zeek and Danne W. Webb filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 20, 2019 Filing 54 Pro Se NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Strike G. Gabriel Zorogastaua, Phillip J.R. Zeek, and Danne W. Webb Alleged Motions to Strike (Doc's [36, 37, 40, 41, 44, 46 47, and 48] And All Subsequent Filings for Repeated Harassment Obstructing These Proceedings With Frivolous Filings Submitted in Bad-Faith by Gary W. Norman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 18, 2019 Filing 50 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Inc..(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 53 Pro Se MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 52 Pro Se SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #36 MOTION to strike , #40 MOTION to strike Joinder in Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion To Strike on behalf of Plaintiff Gary W. Norman. Reply suggestions due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #36 , #40 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 51 Pro Se NOTICE of filing Objection and Motion to Strike Lawyers Danne W. Webb Mo Bar #39384 [Doc # 41] and G. Gabriel Zorogastua Mo. Bar # 59643 and Phillip J. R. Zeek Mo. Bar #65298 Responses to Plaintiffs Mandatory Judicial Notice[Doc # 37] by Gary W. Norman. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of appearance by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Inc. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 48 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #36 MOTION to strike Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiff's Notice For Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, Motion To Strike, And Objections And Motion To Strike (Doc. Nos. 44 & 46-47) And Reply In Support Of Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Complaint And Rico Statement filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 47 PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Gary W. Norman. Plaintiff's Notice to the Court for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 Attorney G. Gabriel Zorogastua Mo. Bar # 59643 and Phillip J. R. Zeek Mo. Bar # 65298 Refused to File for Official Entry. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 46 PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Gary W. Norman. "Objection and Motion to Strike Lawyers Attorneys G. Gabriel Zorogastua Mo. Bar # 59643 and Phillip J. R. Zeek Mo. Bar # 65298 Motion to Strike". NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 45 PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Gary W. Norman. Plaintiff's Notice to the Court of Adjudicative Facts to Which Their [sic] is no Dispute Federal Rules of Evidence 201(d). NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 44 PRO SE REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION for order "Motion to Strike Lawyers G. Gabriel Zorogastua Mo. Bar # 59643 and Phillip J.R. Zeek Mo. Bar # 65298 Responses to Plaintiffs Mandatory Judicial Notice" on behalf of Plaintiff Gary W. Norman. (Related document(s) #3 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 43 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian.(Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to consolidate cases Non-Objection to Consolidation filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 41 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION for order Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Mandatory Judicial Notice filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian. Reply suggestions due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to strike Joinder in Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion To Strike filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #35 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Camille R. Nicodemus for Trans Union allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union.(Lubben, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to motion re #3 MOTION for order Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for "Mandatory Judicial Notice" filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 9/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to strike filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 35 Motion to allow Camille R. Nicodemus to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6488306) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union. (Lubben, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendant Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C..(Vollet, Heidi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendants Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc..(Vollet, Heidi)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 motion for extension of time. Defendant Trans Union has until 10/3/19 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Plaintiff's Motion for Mandatory Judicial Notice #3 . Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union (Lubben, Todd)
September 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
September 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by Paul G. White on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Paul G. White added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul G. White added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul G. White added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(White, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of appearance by Brian K. Asberry on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(Asberry, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 motion for extension of time. Defendant Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr, P.C. has until 10/3/2019 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 9/11/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Defendants Central Trust Bank, Central Bancompany, Inc., and Central Trust Company have until 10/3/2019 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 9/11/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. (Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.(pty:dft))(Clement, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(Clement, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time in which to file a responsive pleading filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of appearance by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. (Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.(pty:dft))(Vollet, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time in which to file a responsive pleading filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of appearance by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(Vollet, Heidi)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 PRO SE MOTION for order Mandatory Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's RICO Complaint; Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Pursuant to Federal Rule 201(d) filed by Gary W. Norman. Prepared Attached Proposed Order forwarded to Chambers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to motion re #5 MOTION to join Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Non-Objection to Consolidation filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 9/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. Experian served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Mandatory Judicial Notice. Defendant Equifax has until 9/12/19 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion. Signed on 9/3/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Inc.(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to the Order filed 8/26/19 (Doc. 6), Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer assigned to case. PLEASE NOTE: New case number 19-03295-CV-S-RK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing Duplicate RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. Secured Parties Central Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Boone County National Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 by Gary W. Norman. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing of Duplicate RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. The Central Trust Bank Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. Boone County National Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Bancompany Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Bank of the Ozarks served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; City Bank and Trust Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Empire Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; First National Bank of Audrian County served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; First National Bank of St. Louis served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Jefferson Bank of Missouri served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Metcalf Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; ONB Bank and Trust Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Ozark Mountain Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; The Central Trust Bank Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Third National Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. Central Bank of Audrian County served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Mortgage Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Trust & Investment Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Trust & Investment Holding Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; City Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Investor Services Insurance, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gary W. Norman. Trans Union served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Equifax Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to transfer. Signed on 8/26/2019 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION for Joinder of Parties Pursuant to Rule 19(a) Case's [sic] No's: 6:19-cv-3296-RK and 6:19-cv-3295-DPR filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 19, 2019 RECEIPT number KCMO079361 in the amount of $400.00 (civil filing fee) issued to Gary W. Norman. (Woods, Gloria)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Inc.. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trans Union. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Bank of Audrian County, Central Mortgage Company, Central Trust & Investment Company, Central Trust & Investment Holding Company, City Bank, Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C., Investor Services Insurance, Inc.. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boone County National Bank, Central Bancompany Inc., Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc., Central Bank of the Ozarks, City Bank and Trust Company, Empire Bank, First National Bank of Audrian County, First National Bank of St. Louis, Jefferson Bank of Missouri, Metcalf Bank, ONB Bank and Trust Company, Ozark Mountain Bank, Third National Bank. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boone County National Bank. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION for Mandatory Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's RICO Complaint; Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authroities; Proposed Order filed by Gary W. Norman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)NEF mailed to plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement Normans Verified Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Monetary Damages by Gary W. Norman (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Ex N, #15 Ex O, #16 Ex P, #17 Ex Q, #18 Ex R, #19 Ex 43, #20 Ex 1, #21 Ex S, #22 Ex T, #23 Ex U, #24 Ex V, #25 Ex W, #26 Ex X, #27 Ex Y, #28 Ex Z, #29 Ex AA)NEF mailed to plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Furtak, Rebecca).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants Gary W. Norman. Filing fee $400 paid, receipt number to be provided. Service due by 11/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. The Central Trust Bank Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metcalf Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Audrian County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Shelly A. Kintzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Central Trust Bank Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Paul G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONB Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union
Represented By: Camille R. Nicodemus
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Bank of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone County National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investor Services Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of Audrian County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bancompany Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Paul G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Trust & Investment Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo G. Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of the Ozarks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Craig L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Central Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Trust & Investment Company
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Paul G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Mountain Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?