Owens v. The Central Trust Bank Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry D Owens
Defendant: Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C., Metcalf Bank, Equifax, First National Bank of Audrian County, Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C., The Central Trust Bank Inc., Boone County National Bank, Trans Union, Jefferson Bank of Missouri, Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc., First National Bank of St. Louis, Investor Services Insurance, Inc., City Bank and Trust Company, Third National Bank, City Bank, Central Bancompany Inc., Empire Bank, Central Trust & Investment Holding Company, Central Bank of Audrain County, Central Bank of the Ozarks, Experian, ONB Bank & Trust Company, Central Mortgage Company, First Central Bank, Central Trust & Investment Company, Ozark Mountain Bank and Central Bank of Audrian County
Case Number: 6:2019cv03296
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 85 PRO SE MOTION Plaintiff Terry D. Owens "Second Request" for an Order for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading as to #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #63 MOTION to strike #2 Notice of filing,, #1 Complaint,,, #33 MOTION to strike , Trans Union, LLC's Joinder In Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Motion To Strike The Complaint and RICO Case Statement [Doc. 33] And Equifax's, #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #68 , #71 , #63 , #66 , #64 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #78 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Craig L Sanders for Experian allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
October 11, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #57 MOTION for order, #82 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #57 MOTION for order Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Joinder in Trans Union, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #57 , #82 ) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #57 MOTION for order filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
October 9, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of filing Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time by Equifax (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 80 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #57 MOTION for order to Disqualify Counsel filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendants Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #57 ) (Vollet, Heidi)
October 9, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE to motion re #76 MOTION for extension of time filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendants Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 78 Motion to allow Craig L. Sanders to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6526336) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. (Webb, Danne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for extension of time to submit reply in support of Equifax's motion to strike filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 76 Pro Se MOTION for extension of time in Which to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 75 Pro Se MOTION for order for Full Disclosure of Filings-Transparency filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 74 Pro Se MOTION for order for Judicial Determination on Everything Plaintiff Filed filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 73 Pro Se MOTION to Strike Defendant's Experian Doc #58 , Trans Union Doc [59, 63], and Equifax Doc #60 for Violating Fed. R. Civ. P. "Rule 12(f)" filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
October 3, 2019 Filing 72 SUGGESTIONS in support re #71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Defendant Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Kintzel, Shelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kintzel, Shelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of appearance by Shelly A. Kintzel on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. (Attorney Shelly A. Kintzel added to party Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.(pty:dft))(Kintzel, Shelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 69 SUGGESTIONS in support re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendant Central Bancompany Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #68 ) (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 67 SUGGESTIONS in support re #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendant Central Trust & Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #66 ) (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Central Trust & Investment Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clement, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 65 SUGGESTIONS in support re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendant The Central Trust Bank Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #64 ) (Vollet, Heidi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to strike #2 Notice of filing,, #1 Complaint,,, #33 MOTION to strike , Trans Union, LLC's Joinder In Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Motion To Strike The Complaint and RICO Case Statement [Doc. 33] And Equifax's Response In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Mandatory Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiff's RICO Complaint [Doc. 34] filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 , #1 , #33 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 10/3/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
October 1, 2019 Filing 60 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #54 MOTION for order to Disqualify These Persons G. Gabriel Zorogastaua, Phillip J.R. Zeek and Danne W. Webb, #50 MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest, #48 MOTION to strike Resp to Motions 48-50 and 53-54 filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #54 , #50 , #48 ) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 1, 2019 Filing 59 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #50 MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Defendant Trans Union. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #50 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
October 1, 2019 Filing 58 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #50 MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #50 ) (Webb, Danne)
September 26, 2019 Filing 57 PRO SE MOTION for order filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burch, Steve)
September 23, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for order DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS, MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO MOTION TO STRIKE, AND JOINDER IN REPLY [Doc 45] [Doc 48] filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne)
September 23, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of appearance by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian (Webb, Danne)
September 20, 2019 Filing 54 Pro Se MOTION for order to Disqualify These Persons G. Gabriel Zorogastaua, Phillip J.R. Zeek and Danne W. Webb filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 20, 2019 Filing 53 Pro Se NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Strike G. Gabriel Zorogastaua, Phillip J.R. Zeek, and Danne W. Webb Alleged Motions to Strike (Doc's [36, 37, 40, 41, 44, 46 47, and 48] And All Subsequent Filings for Repeated Harassment Obstructing These Proceedings With Frivolous Filings Submitted in Bad-Faith by Terry D Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/19/2019 as Document No. 51, Motion for Extension of Time. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. No further action is required by counsel in this matter, however, because the motion has been ruled upon. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Burch, Steve)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #16 MOTION for order Mandatory Judicial Notice. Defendant Trans Union's Suggestions in opposition/response is due by 10/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 9/20/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #16 MOTION for order Mandatory Judicial Notice filed by Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order Granting Trans Union Extension Of Time To Respond)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Nicodemus, Camille)
September 18, 2019 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 50 Pro Se MOTION for order for Statement by This Honorable Court Judge Roseann Ketchmark Regarding A Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 49 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #37 MOTION to strike Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion to Strike on behalf of Plaintiff Terry D Owens. Reply suggestions due by 10/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #37 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 48 Pro Se MOTION to strike Objection and Motion to Strike Lawyers Danne W. Webb Bar #39384 and G. Gabriel Zorogastua Mo. Bar # 59643 and Phillip J. R. Zeek Mo. Bar # 65298 Responses to Plaintiffs Mandatory Judicial Notice filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of appearance by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 45 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #42 MOTION to strike Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiff's Notice For Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, Motion To Strike, And Objections And Motion To Strike (Doc. Nos. 41-43) And Reply In Support Of Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Complaint And RICO Statement filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax. Reply suggestions due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #42 ) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 44 PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Terry D Owens. Plaintiff's Notice to the Court of Adjudicative Facts to Which Their [sic] is no Dispute Federal Rules of Evidence 201(d). NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 43 PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #33 MOTION to strike Objection and Motion to Strike Lawyers Attorney G. Gabriel Zorogastua Mo. Bar # 59643 and Phillip J. R. Zeek Mo Bar # 65298 Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Terry D Owens. Reply suggestions due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #33 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 42 PRO SE MOTION to strike Motion to Strike Lawyers G. Gabriel Zorogastua No. Bar #59643 and Phillip J.R. Zeek Mo. Bar # 65298 Responses to Plaintiffs Mandatory Judicial Notice filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 41 PRO SE NOTICE of filing, Plaintiff's Notice to the Court for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 by Terry D Owens. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 40 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian.(Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to consolidate cases Non-Objection to Consolidation filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 38 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #16 MOTION for order Mandatory Judicial Notice Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Mandatory Judicial Notice filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian. Reply suggestions due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to strike Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion to Strike filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union.(Lubben, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Camille R. Nicodemus for Trans Union allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to motion re #16 MOTION for order Mandatory Judicial Notice Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for "Mandatory Judicial Notice" filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax. Reply suggestions due by 9/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to strike filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 Motion to allow Camille R. Nicodemus to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6488379) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union. (Lubben, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendant Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C..(Vollet, Heidi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Defendants Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc..(Vollet, Heidi)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 motion for extension of time. Defendant Trans Union has until 10/3/19 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lubben, Todd)
September 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of appearance by Paul G. White on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Paul G. White added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul G. White added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Paul G. White added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(White, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by Brian K. Asberry on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(Asberry, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 motion for extension of time. Defendant Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr, P.C. have until 10/3/19 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 9/11/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time. Defendants Central Trust Bank, Central Bancompany, Inc., and Central Trust Company have until 10/3/19 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 9/11/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. (Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.(pty:dft))(Clement, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(Clement, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time in which to file a responsive pleading filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of appearance by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. (Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.(pty:dft))(Vollet, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for extension of time in which to file a responsive pleading filed by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vollet, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Heidi Doerhoff Vollet on behalf of Central Bancompany Inc., Central Trust & Investment Company, The Central Trust Bank Inc. (Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party Central Bancompany Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party Central Trust & Investment Company(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Doerhoff Vollet added to party The Central Trust Bank Inc.(pty:dft))(Vollet, Heidi)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 PRO SE MOTION for order Mandatory Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's RICO Complaint; Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Pursuant to Federal Rule 201(d) filed by Terry D. Owens. Prepared Attached Proposed Order forwarded to Chambers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to motion re #4 MOTION to join Defendant Equifax Inc.'s Non-Objection to Consolidation filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax. Reply suggestions due by 9/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Experian served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. City Bank and Trust Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Empire Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; First Central Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; First National Bank of St. Louis served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Jefferson Bank of Missouri served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Metcalf Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; ONB Bank & Trust Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Ozark Mountain Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Central Trust & Investment Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Trust & Investment Holding Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; City Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Investor Services Insurance, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Third National Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Central Bank of Audrian County served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Mortgage Company served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Boone County National Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Bancompany Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Central Bank of the Ozarks served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; First National Bank of Audrian County served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; The Central Trust Bank Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Trans Union served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Terry D Owens. Equifax served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 motion to Object to the Notice of Inclusion in the Mediation and Assessment Program without prejudice per MAP General order section V(D)[3-1]. Signed on 8/26/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION to Object to the Notice of Inclusion in the Mediation and Assessment Program (MAP)re #3 Notice of MAPN, filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)NEF mailed to plaintiff.(Related document(s) #3 ) (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Joinder of Parties Pursuant to Rule 19(a) Case's [sic] No's: 6:19-cv-3296-RK and 6:19-cv-3295-DPR filed by Terry D Owens. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 19, 2019 RECEIPT number KCMO079363 in the amount of $400.00 (civil filing fee) issued to Terry D Owens. (Woods, Gloria)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Bank and Trust Company, Empire Bank, First Central Bank, First National Bank of St. Louis, Jefferson Bank of Missouri, Metcalf Bank, ONB Bank & Trust Company, Ozark Mountain Bank. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Trust & Investment Company, Central Trust & Investment Holding Company, City Bank, Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C., Investor Services Insurance, Inc., Third National Bank. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Bank of Audrian County, Central Mortgage Company. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boone County National Bank, Central Bancompany Inc., Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc., Central Bank of the Ozarks, First National Bank of Audrian County, The Central Trust Bank Inc.. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trans Union. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Plaintiffs RICO Case Statement Owens Verified Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Monetary Damages by Terry D Owens (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Ex N, #15 Ex O, #16 Ex P, #17 Ex Q, #18 Ex R, #19 Ex 43, #20 Ex 1, #21 Ex S, #22 Ex T, #23 Ex U, #24 Ex V, #25 Ex W, #26 Ex X, #27 Ex Y, #28 Ex Z, #29 Ex AA)(Furtak, Rebecca)NEF mailed to Plaintiff.
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Boone County National Bank, Central Bancompany Inc., Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc., Central Bank of Audrian County, Central Bank of the Ozarks, Central Mortgage Company, Central Trust & Investment Company, Central Trust & Investment Holding Company, City Bank, City Bank and Trust Company, Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C., Empire Bank, Equifax, Experian, First Central Bank, First National Bank of Audrian County, First National Bank of St. Louis, Investor Services Insurance, Inc., Jefferson Bank of Missouri, Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C., Metcalf Bank, ONB Bank & Trust Company, Ozark Mountain Bank, The Central Trust Bank Inc., Third National Bank, Trans Union Terry D Owens. Filing fee $400, receipt number to be provided. Service due by 11/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)NEF mailed to plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. The Central Trust Bank Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dogwood Insurance Agency, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metcalf Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Guillermo G. Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Audrian County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr P.C.
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Shelly A. Kintzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Central Trust Bank Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Paul G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone County National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union
Represented By: Camille R. Nicodemus
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Bank of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bancompany Merger Corporation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investor Services Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bancompany Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Paul G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Trust & Investment Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of Audrain County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of the Ozarks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Craig L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONB Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Central Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Trust & Investment Company
Represented By: Matthew A. Clement
Represented By: Heidi Doerhoff Vollet
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Paul G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Mountain Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of Audrian County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?