Reed v. Smart et al
Plaintiff: Steven L. Reed
Defendant: Jane Doe, Vice Presidents of Missouri State University, Chief of Police, John Doe, Library Staff, City of Springfield, Missouri, Governor of Missouri, Missouri State University Board of Governors, Missouri State University Security Guard and Cliff Smart
Case Number: 6:2019cv03348
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's motion to Allow Federal Marshals to Deliver Complaint is DENIED as Moot. Signed on 11/27/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US mail on 11/27/19 to Steven L. Reed, 2010 S. Ingram Mill Rd F-6, Springfield, MO 65804 and via email to mrstevenlreed@yahoo.com. (Cordell, Annette)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Se MOTION for order for Leave of Court to Allow Federal Marshals to Deliver Complaint and Exhibits in Instant Action filed by Steven L. Reed. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, (Doc. 8), is granted, and on reconsideration the Court adheres to the rulings set forth in the October 25, 2019, Order. Signed on 11/20/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 11/20/19 to Steve Reed, 2010 S. Ingram Mill Rd F-6, Springfield, MO 65804, and via email to mrstevenlreed@yahoo.com. (Cordell, Annette)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION Plaintiff Steven L Reed' Motion in Favor of Particulars of Court Order Dated October 25, 2019 Except Two Portions, One Dealing With The History of Habitual Abuse by MSU and City of Springfield Missouri in Denying and Punishing Reed for His Use of Constitutional Rights Including Political Association and the Right to Effect Governmental Functions Which is the Cruz/Central Issue of the Instant Case and the Issue of the Governor Being a Defendant re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, filed by Steven L. Reed. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED but is limited as detailed in this Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Plaintiff's complaint electronically and to docket the complaint as having been filed on the date tendered, September 30, 2019. The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order and the appropriate service forms to Plaintiff as detailed in this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and service forms after receiving the necessary information from Plaintiff and to deliver same to the United States Marshal for service upon Defendants, pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Marshal may attempt service by mail. Signed on 10/25/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) Modified on 10/28/2019. Copy of this order and service forms, including USM-285 form, mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Missouri State University Security Guard, Vice Presidents of Missouri State University, Cliff Smart, Library Staff, Missouri State University Board of Governors. (Wade, Bryan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable David P. Rush, this case was randomly reassigned to the Honorable Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 6:19-3348-CV-S-BP. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, Steve)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants Steven L. Reed. Filing fee $0, receipt number IFP. Service due by 12/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 10/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Steven L. Reed, re Motion to Proceed IFP, Complaint, Ex 3 Video "Reed and Security Guard" received in Springfield Clerk's Office via hand-delivery and will be maintained in Court file. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steven L. Reed. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Smart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Presidents of Missouri State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Library Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri State University Board of Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri State University Security Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?