Silver Dollar City, LLC v. Adrenalin Attractions, LLC
Plaintiff: Silver Dollar City, LLC
Defendant: Adrenalin Attractions, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv03369
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Robbie L. Phillips for Adrenalin Attractions, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to allow Robbie L. Phillips to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6618906) filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. (Cooley, Drey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re #18 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Defendant Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Cooley, Drey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cooley, Drey)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Adrenalin Attractions, LLC answer due 12/6/2019. No further extensions of this deadline shall be granted. Signed on 12/2/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
November 30, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or other Responsive Pleading filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cooley, Drey)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Adrenalin Attractions, LLC answer due 11/29/2019. Signed on 11/22/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or other responsive pleading filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cooley, Drey)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Adrenalin Attractions, LLC answer due 11/22/2019. Signed on 11/18/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or other Responsive Pleading filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cooley, Drey)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due 11/15/2019. Signed on 11/6/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or other Responsive Pleading filed by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cooley, Drey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Drey Cooley on behalf of Adrenalin Attractions, LLC (Attorney Drey Cooley added to party Adrenalin Attractions, LLC(pty:dft))(Cooley, Drey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 ***Remark Email sent to USPTO regarding Notice of Suit. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Silver Dollar City, LLC. Adrenalin Attractions, LLC served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Hammons, John)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff for Silver Dollar City, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
October 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adrenalin Attractions, LLC, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) Application Serial No. 88,369,571; Application Serial No. 4,579,186; Application No. 87,742,831. Plaintiff(s): Silver Dollar City, LLC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): John D. Hammons, Jr., Ellis, Ellis, Hammons & Johnson, PC, 901 St. Louis Street, Suite 600, Springfield, MO 65806 Defendant(s): Adrenalin Attractions, LLC Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): Rob L. Phillips, FisherBroyles, LLP, 5670 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1800, Los Angeles, CA 9006 The civil complaint is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number amowdc-6543422) filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Silver Dollar City, LLC. (Hammons, John)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/18/19 as Document No. 2, Motion to allow John D. Hammons, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. The document has been deleted as the incorrect Affiant was named. Counsel will refile the correct document naming the correct Affiant. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/17/19 as Document No. 1-6, Affidavit Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The document has been deleted as it is to be filed as a separate document. Counsel will refile the document as a separate Motion. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to allow John D. Hammons, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6543422) filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Silver Dollar City, LLC. (Hammons, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adrenalin Attractions, LLC filed by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Silver Dollar City, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6543284. Service due by 1/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Website, #2 Exhibit B-Twitter, #3 Exhibit C-FaceBook, #4 Exhibit D-C&D Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Affidavit Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hammons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver Dollar City, LLC v. Adrenalin Attractions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrenalin Attractions, LLC
Represented By: Robbie L. Phillips
Represented By: Drey Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Dollar City, LLC
Represented By: John D. Hammons, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?